Global Patent Index - EP 0978850 A2

EP 0978850 A2 2000-02-09 - Multilayer flat cable

Title (en)

Multilayer flat cable

Title (de)

Mehrschichtiges Flachkabel

Title (fr)

Câble plat multicouches

Publication

EP 0978850 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99660123 A

Priority

FI 981697 A

Abstract (en)

A multilayer flat cable (1), comprising a continuous strip of thin sheet (1a). The strip of thin sheet (1a) is provided with folding zones (A, B, C) extending lengthwise thereof, at which the strip of thin sheet (1a) is bent for the multilayer cable (1). In line with the folding zones (A, B, C) are weakenings (2, 2a) extending lengthwise of the cable (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/08 (2006.01); H01B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 7/0018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978850 A2 20000209; EP 0978850 A3 20001220; BR 9903419 A 20010320; CA 2279578 A1 20000204; CN 1244020 A 20000209; FI 981697 A0 19980804; FI 981697 A 20000205; JP 2000057856 A 20000225; PL 334766 A1 20000214

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-26 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030826

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI