Global Patent Index - EP 0978859 A2

EP 0978859 A2 2000-02-09 - Electrical installation device with a thermally sensitive element in the disconnection chain

Title (en)

Electrical installation device with a thermally sensitive element in the disconnection chain

Title (de)

Elektrische Installationseinrichtung mit wärmeempfindlichem Element in einer Abschaltkette

Title (fr)

Equipement d'installation électrique avec un élément thermosensible dans la chaîne de déconnexion

Publication

EP 0978859 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99114168 A

Priority

DE 19834973 A

Abstract (en)

The device has contacts or breaker contacts, a triggering device (3,4) with a heat sensitive element (5), a switching lock and/or a test or monitoring device and is protected against thermal overload by a heat sensitive element in a switch-off chain. During overload, a heat bridge (9) made of a good thermal conductor is directed from a region (2) of high heat generation towards the heat sensitive element (5) of the triggering device (4,5).

Abstract (de)

Elektrische Installationseinrichtung, die mit Kontakten bzw. schutzkontakten, einer Auslöseeinrichtung 3; 4 mit wärmeempfindlichem Element 5, einem oder mehreren der Bauelemente Schaltschloß, Prüf- bzw. Überwachungseinrichtung arbeitet, und die gegen thermische Überlastung durch ein wärmeempfindliches Element (5) in einer Abschaltkette geschützt ist. Es ist vorgesehen, daß von einem Bereich hoher Wärmeentwicklung (2) bel Überlastung eine Wärmebrücke (9) aus gut wärmeleitendem Material zum wärmeempfindlichen Element (5) der Auslöseeinrichtung (4, 5) eingerichtet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/14; H01H 37/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 37/34 (2006.01); H01H 71/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/145 (2013.01); H01H 37/34 (2013.01); H01H 2061/0115 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978859 A2 20000209; EP 0978859 A3 20010328; DE 19834973 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-16 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040326

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010927

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI