Global Patent Index - EP 0978902 A3

EP 0978902 A3 2001-02-14 - Crimp-on connector for flat cable

Title (en)

Crimp-on connector for flat cable

Title (de)

Crimpverbinder für Flachleitungen

Title (fr)

Connecteur à sertissage pour câble plat

Publication

EP 0978902 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115539 A

Priority

DE 19835022 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0978902A2] A crimp connector (1) for two flexible flat cables (11,12) includes a carrier element (2) which runs mainly transversely to the length of the flat cables to be joined. Also included is a contact element (3) which runs mainly in the length direction of the flat cables and which is fixed on the carrier element (2). An electrically conducting contact element (3) is provided for each conductor path (10) of the flat flexible cables (11,12), and a number of retainers (4) are provided at each contact element (3) and can be durably engaged with the flat flexible cables. At least one cable-piercing device (5) is provided at each contact element and penetrates the conductor path (10) of the flat flexible cable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/61 (2011.01); H01R 12/69 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/613 (2013.01); H01R 12/69 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978902 A2 20000209; EP 0978902 A3 20010214

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-07-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI