Global Patent Index - EP 0978904 A1

EP 0978904 A1 2000-02-09 - Low profile electrical connector for flat circuits

Title (en)

Low profile electrical connector for flat circuits

Title (de)

Elektrischer Kleinprofilverbinder für Flachstromkreise

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique à profil compact pour circuits plats

Publication

EP 0978904 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99113919 A

Priority

JP 21960798 A

Abstract (en)

An electrical connector (1) is provided for flat circuits. The connector includes a low profile housing (3) having a bottom face (3a) and a front end (9). The front end has an elongated opening (5) for receiving an end of a flat circuit inserted into the opening in a direction generally parallel to the bottom face (3a). A plurality of mounting recesses (11) are provided in the bottom face (3a) spaced longitudinally along the opening. A plurality of terminals (4) are mounted through the bottom face (3a) of the housing and include mounting sections (21) inserted into the mounting recesses (11). The terminals include contact sections (17) for engagement with appropriate conductors of the flat circuit at the opening. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/28; H01R 12/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/00 (2006.01); H01R 12/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 12/88 (2013.01); H01R 12/79 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978904 A1 20000209; JP 2000048886 A 20000218; JP 3316747 B2 20020819; KR 20000011759 A 20000225; SG 81288 A1 20010619; TW 433670 U 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020504

2000-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001030

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI