Global Patent Index - EP 0978908 A1

EP 0978908 A1 2000-02-09 - Electrical and mechanical connector module for electrical receiver

Title (en)

Electrical and mechanical connector module for electrical receiver

Title (de)

Elektrischer und mechanischer Verbindungsmodul für elektrischen Empfänger

Title (fr)

Module de connexion électrique et mécanique pour récepteur électrique

Publication

EP 0978908 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98420141 A

Priority

EP 98420141 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical connection module has a base section (6) with a support area having an electrical coupling area (13). A complementary unit (7) with an electrical receiver (1) mounted behind it fits flush with the base, and mates with the electrical contacts with further contacts (14) in the coupling zone.

Abstract (fr)

Ce module de connexion d'un récepteur électrique (1) sur un support comportant au moins une source d'alimentation électrique comprend : une embase (6) solidarisée audit support, munie d'au moins une zone de couplage électrique (13, 15) par contact frontal ; et un organe complémentaire ou flasque (7), solidarisé audit récepteur électrique (1), et susceptible de venir se plaquer contre ladite embase (6), ledit organe complémentaire étant également muni d'au moins une zone de couplage électrique (14, 16) disposée de telle sorte à entrer en contact frontal avec le contact électrique (13, 15) de l'embase (6) lorsque l'organe complémentaire et ladite embase sont plaqués l'un contre l'autre, l'embase (6) et l'organe (7) présentant des éléments complémentaires (13, 15), destinés à coopérer les uns avec les autres, de telle sorte à faire coïncider les zones de couplage lorsqu'ils sont plaqués l'un <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/533

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/533 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/533 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0978908 A1 20000209; EP 0978908 B1 20030507; DE 69814377 D1 20030612

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090803

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090803

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080815

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2004-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *REEL

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030831

2003-08-08 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030808

2003-07-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814377 P 20030612

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE GB

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000704

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI