Global Patent Index - EP 0979042 A1

EP 0979042 A1 2000-02-16 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING WAISTBANDS FOR PANTY HOSE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING WAISTBANDS FOR PANTY HOSE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON BUNDEN AN STRUMPFHOSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE DES CEINTURES SUR DES COLLANTS

Publication

EP 0979042 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98916618 A

Priority

  • AT 9800107 W
  • AT 73197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848650A1] The invention relates to a method for producing waistbands for panty hose, wherein a seamless band is first circularly knitted, before being sewn to the upper edge of the panty hose.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41B 9/14; A41B 11/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 9/14 (2006.01); A41B 11/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41B 9/14 (2013.01); A41B 11/14 (2013.01); D04B 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848650A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848650 A1 19981105; AT 213917 T 20020315; AT 404660 B 19990125; AT A73197 A 19980615; DE 59803280 D1 20020411; EP 0979042 A1 20000216; EP 0979042 B1 20020306; JP 2001526738 A 20011218

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150424

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140423

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060424

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061101

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060424

2006-04-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060424

2005-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050426

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050424

2005-04-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050421

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050420

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050419

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050413

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020517

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803280 20020411

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213917 T 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991007

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI