Global Patent Index - EP 0979044 A1

EP 0979044 A1 2000-02-16 - LIGHTWEIGHT FIREFIGHTER GARMENT WITH DURABLE COLLAR AND WRISTLET MATERIAL

Title (en)

LIGHTWEIGHT FIREFIGHTER GARMENT WITH DURABLE COLLAR AND WRISTLET MATERIAL

Title (de)

LEICHTE FEUERWEHRBEKLEIDUNG MIT DAUERHAFTEM MATERIAL FÜR KRAGEN UND MANSCHETTEN

Title (fr)

VETEMENT LEGER POUR POMPIERS COMPORTANT UN MATERIAU RESISTANT POUR LE COL ET LES POIGNETS

Publication

EP 0979044 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98951012 A

Priority

  • US 9821262 W
  • US 1518498 A
  • US 16583698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9938399A1] A firefighting garment (10) including: an outer shell (26) of abrasion, flame and heat resistant material selected from a group consisting of an aramid material, a blend of aramid materials, PBI material, and a blend of aramid and PBI materials; a thermal liner (28), positioned within the outer shell and including a batting of needlepunch or nonwoven aramid material, or a blend of such aramid materials stiched to a first face cloth layer (34) of aramid material, a knit collar (20) and arms (14, 16) having knit wristlets (42); and a second face cloth layer (32) of aramid material, positioned within the thermal liner (28); where the material of the outer shell (26), the thermal liner (28) including the collar (20) and wristlets (42), and the second face cloth layer (32) are all treated with a durable, water repellant finish. The firefighting garment (10) is relatively thin and lightweight, thereby minimizing the bulk and reducing the hobbling effect, and reducing the material costs of the garment.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 13/00; A41D 1/02; A41D 31/00; A42B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/00 (2006.01); A41D 27/10 (2006.01); A41D 31/00 (2006.01); A42B 1/04 (2006.01); A62B 17/00 (2006.01); D03D 15/12 (2006.01); D06M 15/256 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 27/10 (2013.01); A41D 13/00 (2013.01); A62B 17/003 (2013.01); D10B 2331/021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9938399 A1 19990805; AT 313972 T 20060115; CA 2285030 A1 19990805; CA 2285030 C 20070327; DE 69832973 D1 20060202; DE 69832973 T2 20060921; EP 0979044 A1 20000216; EP 0979044 A4 20011004; EP 0979044 B1 20051228; ES 2255187 T3 20060616; JP 2001519862 A 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: LION GROUP, INC, DAYTON, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: LION APPAREL, INC., DAYTON, OHIO, US

- Document: DE 69832973

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091008

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061008

2007-07-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060929

2006-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061009

2006-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2255187 T3

2006-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-03-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-03-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-03-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060328

2006-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69832973 P 20060202

2006-01-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-12-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-12-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-12-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051228

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020828

2001-10-04 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 41D 13/00 A, 7A 41D 31/00 B, 7A 41D 1/02 B, 7A 42B 1/00 B, 7A 41D 27/10 B, 7A 62B 17/00 B

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991008

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE