Global Patent Index - EP 0979063 A2

EP 0979063 A2 2000-02-16 - THERAPY AND TRAINING DEVICE

Title (en)

THERAPY AND TRAINING DEVICE

Title (de)

THERAPIE-UND TRAININGSGERAT ZUR ZWANGGEFÜRHTEN KNIEGELENKBEWEGUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT ET D'ENTRAINEMENT

Publication

EP 0979063 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98931975 A

Priority

  • DE 9801125 W
  • DE 19716942 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19716942A1] The invention relates to a therapy and training device (10) for a specific, guided movement of the knee joint, comprising two calf supports (35, 36) positioned on a guide assembly (11). Said calf supports (35, 36) are connected to a transmission element (28) of the guide assembly by means of joining devices (23, 24). The transmission element (28) connects the calf supports (35, 36) in such a way that they move in relation to one another. Thus, a swinging movement of one calf as a result of the user bending his/her knee causes a swinging movement of the other calf in the opposite direction. A lever (34) is provided to connect the calf supports (35, 36) to the joining devices (23, 24), said lever triggering a righting movement (Gxh) around the center of rotation (45) of the joint of the joining device (23, 24) concerned. Said righting movement counteracts the leg being stretched from the point of view of the direction of rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 23/04 (2006.01); A61H 1/02 (2006.01); A63B 23/035 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 23/03533 (2013.01); A61H 1/0259 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1276 (2013.01); A61H 2201/164 (2013.01); A63B 23/0417 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847461A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19716942 A1 19981029; AT 250405 T 20031015; EP 0979063 A2 20000216; EP 0979063 B1 20030924; JP 2002510219 A 20020402; JP 4082742 B2 20080430; US 6520892 B1 20030218; WO 9847461 A2 19981029; WO 9847461 A3 19990128

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160420

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150422

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031106

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809729 P 20031030

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2003-09-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020125

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI