Global patent index - EP 0979086 A2

EP 0979086 A2 2000-02-16 - COMPOSITION FOR MODULATING AMYLOIDOSIS

Title (en)

COMPOSITION FOR MODULATING AMYLOIDOSIS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN ZUR MODULIERUNG VON AMYLOIDOSIS

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE MODULATION DE L'AMYLOIDOSE

Publication

EP 0979086 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98919923 A

Priority

  • US 9808463 W
  • US 84761697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848784A2] Methods for modulating amyloid deposition in a subject are described. An effective amount of at least one ATP binding cassette (ABC) transporter blocker is administered to a subject, such that modulation of amyloid deposition occurs. Methods also include administering an effective amount of at least one ABC transporter blocker, or a pharmaceutically acceptable salt thereof, to a subject such that a disease state associated with amyloidosis is treated. Packaged pharmaceutical compositions for treating amyloidosis are described. The package includes a container for holding an effective amount of a pharmaceutical composition and instructions for using the pharmaceutical composition for treatment of amyloidosis. The pharmaceutical composition includes at least one ABC blocker for modulating amyloid deposition in a subject. Methods for identifying agent which modulate amyloid deposition in a subject are also described. An effective amount of at least one ATP binding cassette (ABC) transporter blocker is administered to an organism, such that modulation of amyloid deposition occurs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/575; A61P 25/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/138 (2006.01); A61K 31/277 (2006.01); A61K 31/352 (2006.01); A61K 31/4045 (2006.01); A61K 31/407 (2006.01); A61K 31/435 (2006.01); A61K 31/4433 (2006.01); A61K 31/46 (2006.01); A61K 31/47 (2006.01); A61K 31/473 (2006.01); A61K 31/475 (2006.01); A61K 31/49 (2006.01); A61K 31/5415 (2006.01); A61K 38/13 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/13 (2013.01); A61K 31/138 (2013.01); A61K 31/277 (2013.01); A61K 31/352 (2013.01); A61K 31/4045 (2013.01); A61K 31/407 (2013.01); A61K 31/46 (2013.01); A61K 31/473 (2013.01); A61K 31/475 (2013.01); A61K 31/49 (2013.01); A61K 31/5415 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9848784A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848784 A2 19981105; WO 9848784 A3 19990812; AU 7260398 A 19981124; CA 2285948 A1 19981105; EP 0979086 A2 20000216; IL 132169 D0 20010319; JP 2002504895 A 20020212

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-05-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE UNIVERSITY OF BRITISH COLUMBIA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/575 A

2004-03-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7A 61P 25/28 B

2004-03-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: COMPOSITION FOR MODULATING AMYLOIDOSIS

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020515

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE