Global Patent Index - EP 0979088 A1

EP 0979088 A1 2000-02-16 - METHOD OF INDUCING VASODILATION AND TREATING PULMONARY HYPERTENSION USING ADENOVIRAL-MEDIATED TRANSFER OF THE NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE GENE

Title (en)

METHOD OF INDUCING VASODILATION AND TREATING PULMONARY HYPERTENSION USING ADENOVIRAL-MEDIATED TRANSFER OF THE NITRIC OXIDE SYNTHASE GENE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR INDUZIERUNG VON GEFÄSSERWEITERUNG UND ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER PULMONALER HOCHBLUTDRUCK MITTELS ADENOVIRUS-GELENKTES TRANSFER DES STICKSTOFFOXIDSYNTHASE GENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE SERVANT A PROVOQUER LA VASODILATATION ET A TRAITER L'HYPERTENSION PULMONAIRE AU MOYEN DU TRANSFERT PROVOQUE PAR ADENOVIRUS DU GENE DE SYNTHASE D'OXYDE NITRIQUE

Publication

EP 0979088 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97933529 A

Priority

  • US 9712510 W
  • US 2191296 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9802170A1] This invention relates to a gene therapy method for inducing pulmonary vasodilation. More specifically, this invention involves introducing the nitric oxide synthase gene into lungs resulting in pulmonary vasodilation. This results in a hypotensive effect in the pulmonary circulation which does not significantly affect systemic blood pressure or cardiac index. This method is useful to treat primary pulmonary hypertension or pulmonary hypertension secondary to various disease states.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/70; C07H 21/04; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/02 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 9/0075 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2799/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9802170 A1 19980122; CA 2260771 A1 19980122; EP 0979088 A1 20000216; EP 0979088 A4 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051020

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031114

2002-11-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/70 A, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7C 12N 15/12 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7A 61K 48/00 B

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990203

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE