Global patent index - EP 0979125 A1

EP 0979125 A1 2000-02-16 - EXPLOSION SUPPRESSION ARRANGEMENTS AND METHODS

Title (en)

EXPLOSION SUPPRESSION ARRANGEMENTS AND METHODS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EXPLOSIONSUNDERDRÜCKUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS DE SUPPRESSION D'EXPLOSION

Publication

EP 0979125 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917456 A

Priority

  • GB 9801192 W
  • GB 9708276 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2324466A] An explosion suppression arrangement for attachment to the outside wall 10 of an area 12 at risk from explosions which, on detection of an explosion in the area, discharges explosion suppressant material 18 into the area to suppress the explosion. The arrangement comprises a container 14, with an outlet 16 closed by a frangible diaphragm 24, a source 20 pressurized gas mounted within the container for producing gas upon activation of the source, and a suppressant distribution device 25. When an explosion is detected, activating the source, the suppressant material is pressurized and the diaphragm will break so discharging the suppressant material through the outlet.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 35/02; A62C 13/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 13/22 (2006.01); A62C 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 35/023 (2013.01); A62C 13/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847572A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2324466 A 19981028; GB 2324466 B 20010228; GB 9708276 D0 19970618; DE 69806241 D1 20020801; DE 69806241 T2 20030227; EP 0979125 A1 20000216; EP 0979125 B1 20020626; WO 9847572 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status

2014-02-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69806241

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KIDDE IP HOLDINGS LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090430

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080616

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69806241

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-01

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2000-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991111

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE