Global patent index - EP 0979139 A1

EP 0979139 A1 2000-02-16 - DEVICE FOR DISINTEGRATING POWDERY MATERIALS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DISINTEGRATING POWDERY MATERIALS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUFSCHLIESSEN EINES PULVRIGEN STOFFES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR LA DESAGREGATION D'UNE MATIERE PULVERULENTE

Publication

EP 0979139 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98922770 A

Priority

  • DE 19717161 A
  • EP 9802424 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19717161A1] The invention relates to a device for continuous disintegration of a hardly wettable powdery material in a liquid. Said device is fitted with a feeding device for the powdery material and a dispersing device arranged downstream, wherein an injector serving as a preparation unit and which is impinged upon by a hydraulic fluid is connected between the feeding device and the dispersing device. The invention enables easy and continuous preparation and prevents agglutinations in the areas that come into contact with the powder while reliably ensuring wetting and disintegration of individual powder particles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 13/10; B01F 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 5/00 (2006.01); B01F 5/04 (2006.01); B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/0075 (2013.01); B01F 5/0057 (2013.01); B01F 5/0413 (2013.01); B01F 2003/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847609A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19717161 A1 19981029; AU 7528698 A 19981113; CA 2293689 A1 19981029; EP 0979139 A1 20000216; EP 0979139 B1 20020717; WO 9847609 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140423

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59804810

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140423

2014-11-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59804810

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130426

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-07-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-02-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804810

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-22

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-07-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020717

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010720

2000-03-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: YTRON PROCESS TECHNOLOGY GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991018

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL