Global Patent Index - EP 0979160 B1

EP 0979160 B1 2001-03-21 - METHOD FOR MACHINING WORKPIECES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MACHINING WORKPIECES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'USINAGE DE PIECES

Publication

EP 0979160 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98931999 A

Priority

  • DE 9801151 W
  • DE 19718306 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9848984A1] The invention relates to a method for machining workpieces, wherein said workpieces are machined on both sides. A workpiece is individually guided to a machined station where it is machined on both sides. After machining, the workpiece is individually conveyed. According to the invention, the machining processes carried out on successive workpieces are co-ordinated in such a way that the first side of one workpiece and the second side of another workpiece are machined in the machining station during a single machining process. One workpiece which is machined on both sides and another workpiece machined on only one size result from each machining process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27F 1/02; B27M 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27F 1/02 (2006.01); B27M 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27F 1/02 (2013.01); B27M 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9848984 A1 19981105; AT 199850 T 20010415; AU 8207498 A 19981124; CZ 297908 B6 20070425; CZ 9903672 A3 20000216; DE 19718306 C1 19981210; EP 0979160 A1 20000216; EP 0979160 B1 20010321; JP 2001522324 A 20011113; PL 186559 B1 20040130; PL 336425 A1 20000619; US 6220315 B1 20010424

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090425

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100424

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090424

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090424

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090430

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090424

2009-12-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2001-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-06-15 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CALVANI SALVI E VERONELLI S.R.L.

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB IT LI PT SE

2001-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199850 T 20010415

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991106

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB IT LI PT SE