Global Patent Index - EP 0979206 A1

EP 0979206 A1 2000-02-16 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILLING BARRELS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILLING BARRELS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÜLLEN VON GEBINDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REMPLIR DES FUTS

Publication

EP 0979206 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98916983 A

Priority

  • DE 19718130 A
  • DE 19720170 A
  • EP 9801549 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849088A1] Disclosed is a method for filling barrels (4), specially kegs, with liquids, wherein at least one gas is dissolved. The barrel (4) is prestressed using a gas before the liquid is filled. Liquid is then fed into the barrel (4) by means of a filling valve (2) pertaining to a filling station (1) and connected to a feed line (3, 8). During filling, the prestress gas contained in the barrel (4) is evacuated. So as not to impair the product, th eprestress gas in the barrel (4) is prestressed at only a partial pressure which corresponds approximately to the saturation pressure of the CO>2< or N>2< which is dissolved in the filled liquid. Said partial pressure is lower than the maximum product pressure occurring in the feed line (8) prior to the filling valve (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 3/12 (2006.01); B67C 3/30 (2006.01); B67C 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/32 (2013.01); Y10T 137/299 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849088A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29712148 U1 19970911; AT 202325 T 20010715; DK 0979206 T3 20010924; EP 0979206 A1 20000216; EP 0979206 B1 20010620; ES 2161047 T3 20011116; JP 2000511139 A 20000829; JP 3335181 B2 20021015; US 6230763 B1 20010515; WO 9849088 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 202325 T

- Effective date: 20180318

2018-05-02 [REG IE MK9A] PATENT EXPIRED

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180317

2018-04-11 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180317

2018-03-21 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20180317

2018-03-19 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20180318

2018-03-18 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59800894

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-06-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2161047 T3

2001-10-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-09-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800894 20010726

2001-07-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-06-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL

2001-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 202325 T 20010715

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHS TILL GMBH

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990721

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL