Global Patent Index - EP 0979207 A1

EP 0979207 A1 2000-02-16 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILLING BARRELS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR FILLING BARRELS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÜLLEN VON GEBINDEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REMPLIR DES FUTS

Publication

EP 0979207 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98920505 A

Priority

  • DE 19718130 A
  • DE 19741254 A
  • EP 9802058 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849089A1] Disclosed is a method for filling barrels (4), specially kegs, with liquids, wherein at least one gas is dissolved. The barrel (4) is prestressed using a gas before the liquid is filled. Liquid is then fed into the barrel (4) by means of a filling valve (2) pertaining to a filling statio (1) and connected to a feed line (3, 8). During filling, the prestress gas contained in the barrel (4) is evacuated. In order to guarantee economical and ecological product processing, the prestress gas in the barrel (4) is prestressed at only a partial pressure whic corresponds approximately to the saturation pressure of the CO>2< or N>2< which is dossolved in the filled liquid. The flow rate speed is measured in the product feed line and is directly adjusted by adapting the volumetric flow rate of said product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 3/32; B67C 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/20 (2006.01); B67C 3/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849089A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718062 U1 19980520; AT 203489 T 20010815; BR 9809432 A 20000613; DK 0979207 T3 20011022; EP 0979207 A1 20000216; EP 0979207 B1 20010725; ES 2161050 T3 20011116; JP 2000511140 A 20000829; JP 3335182 B2 20021015; RU 2181101 C2 20020410; US 6196277 B1 20010306; WO 9849089 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 203489 T

- Effective date: 20180408

2018-05-02 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180407

2018-04-11 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20180407

2018-04-09 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

- Effective date: 20180408

2018-04-08 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59801083

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-07-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011204

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2161050 T3

2001-10-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-08-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801083 20010830

2001-08-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL

2001-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 203489 T 20010815

2000-12-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KHS TILL GMBH

2000-06-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990721

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IE NL