Global patent index - EP 0979208 A1

EP 0979208 A1 2000-02-16 - COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR REDUCING COPPER OXIDE TO METALLIC COPPER

Title (en)

COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR REDUCING COPPER OXIDE TO METALLIC COPPER

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND METHODE ZUM REDUZIEREN VON KUPFEROXID ZU KUPFERMETALL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE L'OXYDE DE CUIVRE EN CUIVRE METALLIQUE

Publication

EP 0979208 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98908643 A

Priority

US 9803406 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2254362A1] A composition for reducing a copper oxide layer to metallic copper so as to facilitate bonding a resin to the metallic copper is disclosed. The composition is an aqueous reducing solution containing a cyclic borane compound. Examples of such cyclic borane compounds include those having nitrogen or sulfur as a ringforming member, such as morpholine borane, piperidine borane, pyridine borane, piperazine borane, 2,6-lutidine borane, 4-methylmorpholine borane, and 1,4-oxathiane borane, and also N,N-diethylaniline borane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01B 6/06; B05D 3/00; B05D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 295/02 (2006.01); B05D 3/00 (2006.01); B05D 5/00 (2006.01); C01B 6/06 (2006.01); C07D 213/18 (2006.01); C07D 327/06 (2006.01); C07F 5/02 (2006.01); C22B 5/00 (2006.01); C22B 15/00 (2006.01); C23C 22/63 (2006.01); C23C 22/83 (2006.01); C23F 3/00 (2006.01); C23G 1/20 (2006.01); H05K 3/38 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

CA 2254362 A1 19990820; CA 2254362 C 20040601; EP 0979208 A1 20000216; EP 0979208 A4 20001025; JP 2001527503 A 20011225; JP 3718722 B2 20051124

INPADOC legal status

2007-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060906

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010620

2000-10-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 01B 6/06 A, 7B 05D 5/00 B, 7B 05D 3/00 B, 7C 23C 22/83 B, 7H 05K 3/38 B

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FAKLER, JOHN

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RUSH, MICHAEL

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CAMPBELL, SCOTT

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990924

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE