Global Patent Index - EP 0979230 A1

EP 0979230 A1 2000-02-16 - 6,7-DISUBSTITUTED-4-AMINOPYRIDO¬2,3-D PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS

Title (en)

6,7-DISUBSTITUTED-4-AMINOPYRIDO¬2,3-D PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS

Title (de)

6,7-DISUBSTITUIERTE-4-AMINOPYRIDO(2,3-D)PYRIMIDINE VERBINDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSES DE 4-AMINOPYRIDO¬2,3-D PYRIMIDINE DISUBSTITUEE EN POSITION 6, 7

Publication

EP 0979230 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917950 A

Priority

  • US 9804127 W
  • US 83439397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9846603A1] A compound having formula (I), wherein R<1>, R<2>, R<3> and R<4> are defined variables selected from the groups as specified herein which include alkyl, aryl, heteroaryl and heterocyclic and substituted versions thereof, a method for inhibiting adenosine kinase by administering a compound thereof, a pharmaceutical composition comprising a therapeutically effective amount of a compound thereof above in combination with a pharmaceutically acceptable carrier, a method of treating cerebral ischemia, epilepsy, nociperception, pain, inflammation and sepsis in a mammal in need of such treatment, comprising administering to the mammal a therapeutically effective amount of a compound thereof, and methods of preparation thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 471/04; A61K 31/505

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/519 (2006.01); A61P 1/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/08 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/22 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 471/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9846603A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9846603 A1 19981022; AR 012435 A1 20001018; AU 7098198 A 19981111; AU 744528 B2 20020228; BG 103861 A 20000630; BR 9809088 A 20000801; CA 2287465 A1 19981022; CN 1259948 A 20000712; CO 4940439 A1 20000724; EP 0979230 A1 20000216; HU 0001402 A2 20001028; HU 0001402 A3 20010129; IL 131892 D0 20010319; JP 2001520649 A 20011030; KR 20010006453 A 20010126; NO 995033 A 19991215; NO 995033 D0 19991015; NZ 337844 A 20011130; PL 336262 A1 20000619; SK 142099 A3 20000516; TR 9902456 T2 20000721; TW 458977 B 20011011; ZA 9802912 B 19981009

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6,7-DISUBSTITUTED-4-AMINOPYRIDO??2,3-D PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS

2006-11-24 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1027096

2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020707

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001227

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BHAGWAT, SHRIPAD, S.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LEE, CHIH-HUNG

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PERNER, RICHARD, J.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GU, YU-GUI

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991110

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19991110;SI PAYMENT 19991110