Global patent index - EP 0979233 A1

EP 0979233 A1 2000-02-16 - METHOD FOR SOLUTION PHASE SYNTHESIS OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR SOLUTION PHASE SYNTHESIS OF OLIGONUCLEOTIDES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE VON OLIGONUKLEOTIDEN IN LÖSUNG

Title (fr)

SYNTHESE D'OLIGONUCLEOTIDES EN SOLUTION

Publication

EP 0979233 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98918629 A

Priority

  • US 9808192 W
  • US 84382097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847910A1] This invention discloses an improved method for the sequential solution phase synthesis of oligonucleotides. The method lends itself to automation and is ideally suited for large scale manufacture oligonucleotides with high efficiency.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07H 19/00; C07H 21/00; C07H 21/02; C07H 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 19/00 (2006.01); C07H 19/04 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/02 (2006.01); C07H 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 19/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847910 A1 19981029; AU 7152098 A 19981113; CA 2286320 A1 19981029; EP 0979233 A1 20000216; EP 0979233 A4 20010321; IL 132377 D0 20010319; JP 2001520660 A 20011030

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-25 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030110

2001-03-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010206

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07H 19/00 A, 7C 07H 21/00 B, 7C 07H 21/02 B, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7C 07H 19/10 B, 7C 07H 19/06 B, 7C 07H 19/16 B, 7C 07C 43/215 B, 7C 07C 43/225 B, 7C 07C 43/23 B, 7C 07F 7/02 B

2000-04-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PROLIGO L.L.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991118

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE