Global Patent Index - EP 0979238 A1

EP 0979238 A1 2000-02-16 - PROSAPTIDE 14-MER FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF MONONEUROPATY AND POLYNEUROPATY ASSOCIATED WITH DIABETES AND CHEMOTHERAPY

Title (en)

PROSAPTIDE 14-MER FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF MONONEUROPATY AND POLYNEUROPATY ASSOCIATED WITH DIABETES AND CHEMOTHERAPY

Title (de)

14-MER PROSAPTIDE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON MONO- UND POLYNEUROPATHIEN IN VERBINDUNG MIT DIABETES UND CHEMOTHERAPIE

Title (fr)

14-MER DU PROSAPTIDE POUR L'UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MONONEUROPATHIE ET DE LA POLYNEUROPATHIE ASSOCIÉS AVEC LE DIABÈTE ET LA CHIMIOTHÉRAPIE

Publication

EP 0979238 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97941027 A

Priority

  • US 9716062 W
  • US 9704143 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2282827A1] The invention provides a method of alleviating neuropathic pain in a subject by administering a neuropathic pain alleviating amount of prosaposin receptor agonist to the subject. The invention also provides a method of inhibiting the onset of neuropathic pain in a subject by administering neuropathic pain alleviating amount of prosaposin receptor agonist to the subject. The present invention also provides prosaposin receptor agonists and the use of these agonists for stimulating neurite outgrowth, inhibiting neural cell death, promoting myelination and inhibiting neural demyelination. In addition, there is provided a method of inhibiting sensory or motor neuropathy by contacting neuronal cells with a composition comprising an effective inhibiting amount of prosaposin receptor agonist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 4/00; A61K 38/10; A61K 38/17; A61K 38/19; C07K 7/00; C07K 14/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61K 9/127 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/10 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/19 (2006.01); A61P 21/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07K 4/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/08 (2006.01); C07K 9/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 4267297 A 19980922; CA 2282827 A1 19980911; EP 0979238 A1 20000216; EP 0979238 A4 20000823; JP 2001524944 A 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081212

2008-06-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PROSAPTIDE 14-MER FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF MONONEUROPATY AND POLYNEUROPATY ASSOCIATED WITH DIABETES AND CHEMOTHERAPY

2006-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040701

2000-08-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 07K 4/00 A, 7C 07K 7/00 B, 7C 07K 14/52 B, 7A 61K 38/10 B, 7A 61K 38/17 B, 7A 61K 38/19 B, 7C 07K 14/475 B

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990930

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE