Global Patent Index - EP 0979238 A4

EP 0979238 A4 2000-08-23 - METHOD OF ALLEVIATING NEUROPATHIC PAIN

Title (en)

METHOD OF ALLEVIATING NEUROPATHIC PAIN

Title (de)

METHODE ZUR HEILUNG NEUROPATHISCHER SCHMERZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES POUR SOULAGER LES DOULEURS NEUROPATHIQUES

Publication

EP 0979238 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97941027 A

Priority

  • US 9716062 W
  • US 9704143 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2282827A1] The invention provides a method of alleviating neuropathic pain in a subject by administering a neuropathic pain alleviating amount of prosaposin receptor agonist to the subject. The invention also provides a method of inhibiting the onset of neuropathic pain in a subject by administering neuropathic pain alleviating amount of prosaposin receptor agonist to the subject. The present invention also provides prosaposin receptor agonists and the use of these agonists for stimulating neurite outgrowth, inhibiting neural cell death, promoting myelination and inhibiting neural demyelination. In addition, there is provided a method of inhibiting sensory or motor neuropathy by contacting neuronal cells with a composition comprising an effective inhibiting amount of prosaposin receptor agonist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 4/00; A61K 38/10; A61K 38/17; A61K 38/19; C07K 7/00; C07K 14/475; C07K 14/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 25/04 (2006.01); A61K 9/127 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/10 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 38/19 (2006.01); A61P 21/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07K 4/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/00 (2006.01); C07K 7/08 (2006.01); C07K 9/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/475 (2006.01); C07K 14/52 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [L] WO 9732895 A1 19970912 - UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al
  • [L] WO 9842746 A2 19981001 - MYELOS NEUROSCIENCES CORP [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9503821 A1 19950209 - BRIEN JOHN S O [US]
  • [A] HIRAIWA, MASAO ET AL: "Cell death prevention, mitogen-activated protein kinase stimulation, and increased sulfatide concentrations in Schwann cells and oligodendrocytes by prosaposin and prosaptides", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U. S. A. (1997), 94(9), 4778-4781, 1997, XP002140103
  • See also references of WO 9839357A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 4267297 A 19980922; CA 2282827 A1 19980911; EP 0979238 A1 20000216; EP 0979238 A4 20000823; JP 2001524944 A 20011204

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20081212

2008-06-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PROSAPTIDE 14-MER FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF MONONEUROPATY AND POLYNEUROPATY ASSOCIATED WITH DIABETES AND CHEMOTHERAPY

2006-12-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040701

2000-08-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07K 4/00 A, 7C 07K 7/00 B, 7C 07K 14/52 B, 7A 61K 38/10 B, 7A 61K 38/17 B, 7A 61K 38/19 B, 7C 07K 14/475 B

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990930

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE