Global Patent Index - EP 0979262 A1

EP 0979262 A1 2000-02-16 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TREATING WASTES BY GASIFICATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR TREATING WASTES BY GASIFICATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABÄLLEN DURCH VERGASUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF SERVANT A TRAITER DES DECHETS PAR GAZEIFICATION

Publication

EP 0979262 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97909579 A

Priority

  • JP 9703814 W
  • JP 11743497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9847985A1] A method and apparatus for treating wastes by two-stage gasification recovers metals or ash content in the wastes in such a state that they can be recycled, and gases containing carbon monoxide (CO) and hydrogen gas (H2) for use as synthesis gas of ammonia (NH3) or production of hydrogen gas. The wastes are gasified in a fluidized-bed reactor (3) at a low temperature. Then, gaseous material and char produced in the fluidized-bed reactor (3) are introduced into the high-temperature combustor (17), and gasified at a high temperature and ash content is converted into molten slag. After water scrubbing and CO conversion reaction, the gas is separated into H2 and residual gas. The residual gas is then supplied to the fluidized-bed reactor (3) as a fluidizing gas.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/54; C10J 3/56; C10J 3/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/54 (2006.01); C10J 3/56 (2006.01); C10J 3/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/721 (2013.01); C10J 3/482 (2013.01); C10J 3/54 (2013.01); C10J 3/56 (2013.01); C10J 3/66 (2013.01); C10J 3/84 (2013.01); C10K 1/101 (2013.01); C10K 3/04 (2013.01); C10G 2300/1003 (2013.01); C10J 2300/0946 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1606 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1693 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1823 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1861 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1884 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9847985A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9847985 A1 19981029; CN 1137249 C 20040204; CN 1253577 A 20000517; DE 69730870 D1 20041028; DE 69730870 T2 20050929; EP 0979262 A1 20000216; EP 0979262 B1 20040922; ES 2229339 T3 20050416

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121022

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101023

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-07-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229339 T3

2004-10-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69730870 P 20041028

2004-09-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-09-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FUJIMURA, HIROYUKI

2004-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIRAYAMA, YOSHIO

2004-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FUJINAMI, SHOSAKU

2004-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAKANO, KAZUO

2004-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IRIE, MASAAKI

2004-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HIROSE, TETSUHISA

2004-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAGATO, SHUICHI

2004-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OSHITA, TAKAHIRO

2004-09-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FUKUDA, TOSHIO

2004-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EBARA CORPORATION

2004-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD.

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020708

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991015

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT