Global patent index - EP 0979309 A1

EP 0979309 A1 2000-02-16 - OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR ENHANCED BIOAVAILABILITY

Title (en)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDES FOR ENHANCED BIOAVAILABILITY

Title (de)

OLIGONUKLEOTIDE MIT VERBESSERTER BIOVERFÜGBARKEIT

Title (fr)

OLIGONUCLEOTIDES PRESENTANT UNE MEILLEURE BIODISPONIBILITE

Publication

EP 0979309 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920076 A

Priority

  • US 9808798 W
  • US 84715197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849348A1] The present invention provides compositions and methods for the alimentary delivery of oligonucleotides in an animal, including a human. Modifications to the oligonucleotide which enhance uptake following alimentary delivery are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; A61K 48/00; C07H 21/00; C07H 21/04; C12N 5/06; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/63

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/7125 (2006.01); A61K 47/12 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C07H 21/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/113 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/113 (2013.01); C07H 21/00 (2013.01); C12N 2310/321 (2013.01); C12N 2310/3341 (2013.01); C12N 2310/346 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C12N 2310/321 + C12N 2310/3527
  2. C12N 2310/321 + C12N 2310/3525
  3. C12N 2310/321 + C12N 2310/3521

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849348 A1 19981105; AU 7272398 A 19981124; AU 738352 B2 20010913; CA 2286396 A1 19981105; CA 2286396 C 20100706; EP 0979309 A1 20000216; EP 0979309 A4 20001018; JP 2000514095 A 20001024; KR 20010020370 A 20010315

INPADOC legal status

2005-08-24 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030124

2000-10-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 12Q 1/68 A, 7C 12N 15/00 B, 7C 12N 15/63 B, 7C 12N 5/06 B, 7C 07H 21/00 B, 7C 07H 21/04 B, 7A 61K 48/00 B, 7A 61K 31/70 B

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DEAN, NICHOLAS, M.

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BENNETT, C., FRANK

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MONIA, BRETT, P.

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DRAPER, KENNETH

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ANDERSON, KEVIN, P.

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BAKER, BRENDA, F.

2000-04-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ECKER, DAVID, J.

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE