Global Patent Index - EP 0979317 A2

EP 0979317 A2 2000-02-16 - PROCESS FOR APPLICATION OF AN INORGANIC COATING TO AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTING BODY

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR APPLICATION OF AN INORGANIC COATING TO AN ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTING BODY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBRINGEN EINER ANORGANISCHEN BESCHICHTUNG AUF EINEN ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGEN KÖRPER

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR APPLIQUER UN REVETEMENT INORGANIQUE SUR UN CORPS ELECTROCONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 0979317 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 97951074 A

Priority

  • DE 9702661 W
  • DE 19646724 A
  • DE 19703489 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6153270A] PCT No. PCT/DE97/02661 Sec. 371 Date May 13, 1999 Sec. 102(e) Date May 13, 1999 PCT Filed Nov. 13, 1997 PCT Pub. No. WO98/21382 PCT Pub. Date May 22, 1998A process of applying an inorganic coating to an electrically conducting body, in particular a metallic workpiece, is characterized with respect to a precisely controllable temperature variation with short temperature changes in an economical and energy-saving operation in that the body first undergoes a preparation. Thereafter, if need be, the body is degreased and/or chemically pretreated and/or blasted. Subsequently, a coating medium is applied to at least the surface region of the body being coated. Then, at least the surface region of the body being coated is heated by induction to a reaction temperature before and/or while and/or after applying the coating medium. Finally, the coating medium is fully reacted to a coating, whereupon the body undergoes a cooling.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 22/00; B05D 3/02; B05D 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/14 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01); C08F 2/46 (2006.01); C23C 22/00 (2006.01); C23C 24/08 (2006.01); C23C 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05D 7/51 (2013.01); C23C 24/08 (2013.01); C23C 26/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9821382A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6153270 A 20001128; AT 218628 T 20020615; AU 5475998 A 19980603; BR 9713354 A 20000125; EP 0979317 A2 20000216; EP 0979317 B1 20020605; ES 2176806 T3 20021201; JP 2001503478 A 20010313; JP 3253977 B2 20020204; KR 100522663 B1 20051019; KR 20000053289 A 20000825; PT 979317 E 20021129; WO 9821382 A2 19980522; WO 9821382 A3 19991028

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-02 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ECNC

2009-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20090305

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-28 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-04-22 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20090305

2009-04-22 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Effective date: 20090305

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081203

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: DACRAL

2003-05-02 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DACRAL

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALT DIPL. ING. WOLFGANG HEISEL

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2176806

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020916

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59707453

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 218628

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-05-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EWALD DOERKEN AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990512

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE