Global Patent Index - EP 0979321 A1

EP 0979321 A1 2000-02-16 - DEVICE FOR OPTIMIZING FABRICS BASED ON MEASURED THREAD DATA AND OPTIMIZATION METHOD

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR OPTIMIZING FABRICS BASED ON MEASURED THREAD DATA AND OPTIMIZATION METHOD

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR OPTIMIERUNG VON GEWEBEN AUFGRUND GEMESSENER GARNDATEN UND OPTIMIERUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR L'OPTIMISATION DE TISSUS FONDEE SUR DES DONNEES DE FIL MESUREES, ET PROCEDE D'OPTIMISATION

Publication

EP 0979321 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98925499 A

Priority

  • DE 19718562 A
  • EP 9802529 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0875611A1] The appts. (11) to give the best woven fabric structure, based on measured yarn data, has at least one monitor (12) to measure the yarn thickness. A woven patterning control (13) gives an input and alteration of the weave. The monitor (12) has a control (14), with an evaluation unit and a display (16), to show the actual fabric structure as computed using the measured yarn dia. and the freely defined weave. The weave structure can be altered and modified according to the yarn thickness, to give the ideal woven fabric.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 19/00; D04B 37/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 19/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850613A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0875611 A1 19981104; AU 7759998 A 19981127; DE 19718562 A1 19981105; EP 0979321 A1 20000216; EP 0979321 B1 20020724; US 6928335 B1 20050809; WO 9850613 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-14 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20080923

2008-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: INGENIEURBUERO DIETER ZWEIGLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2007-04-05 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070405

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. LUSUARDI AG

2003-12-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 04.12.2003 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2003-12-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Effective date: 20030412

2003-12-17 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: CIS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-10-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031006

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Effective date: 20030412

2003-06-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: CIS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-06-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: USTER TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Effective date: 20030412

2003-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-01-22 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804899

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-29

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010704

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991202

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES GB IT LI