Global Patent Index - EP 0979327 A1

EP 0979327 A1 2000-02-16 - SHAPED BLOCK, ESPECIALLY A CONCRETE BLOCK

Title (en)

SHAPED BLOCK, ESPECIALLY A CONCRETE BLOCK

Title (de)

FORMSTEIN, INSBESONDERE AUS BETON

Title (fr)

BRIQUE MOULEE, EN PARTICULIER EN BETON

Publication

EP 0979327 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924217 A

Priority

  • DE 19718363 A
  • EP 9802473 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19718363A1] The invention relates to a shaped block (1), especially a concrete block, for paving. The inventive block has groove-shaped recesses (9, 16) on the underside (8) for improved water drainage, said recesses being positioned preferably vertically on top of each other so as to form cross-shaped channels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01C 11/225 (2013.01); E01C 2201/02 (2013.01); E01C 2201/04 (2013.01); E01C 2201/207 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850632A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19718363 A1 19981105; AT 259920 T 20040315; EP 0979327 A1 20000216; EP 0979327 B1 20040218; WO 9850632 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121101

2013-02-14 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59810799

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20121101

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110513

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080425

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-11-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHEIWILLER ROLF

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-05-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070502

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-04-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59810799

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2004-02-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020829

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991105

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL