Global Patent Index - EP 0979332 A1

EP 0979332 A1 2000-02-16 - METHOD FOR MAKING PREFABRICATED STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS, AND PRESTRESSED STRUCTURE PRODUCED WITH SAID ELEMENTS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING PREFABRICATED STRUCTURAL ELEMENTS, AND PRESTRESSED STRUCTURE PRODUCED WITH SAID ELEMENTS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VORFABRIZIERTER BAUELEMENTE UND VORGESPANNTE BAUKONSTRUKTION AUS SOLCHEN ELEMENTEN HERGESTELLT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'ELEMENTS DE CONSTRUCTION PREFABRIQUES, ET OUVRAGE PRECONTRAINT REALISE AVEC DE TELS ELEMENTS

Publication

EP 0979332 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99904942 A

Priority

  • FR 9900411 W
  • FR 9802406 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775492A1] The invention concerns two consecutive prefabricated concrete elements (1a, 1b) with respectively two contact surfaces (7a, 7b) matching in form, and comprising each at least a pair of prestressed jacket sections (10a, 10b) arranged so as to be located in the extension of each other when the contact surfaces (7a, 7b) of the elements are pressed against each other. Each of said jacket sections (10a, 10b) is connected, towards the contact surface of the element comprising said section, to a respective sleeve (18a, 18b) embedded with it in the element concrete. At least one of the sleeves (18a, 18b) whereto the two jacket sections (10a, 10b) of one pair are connected has, towards the element contact surface, an internal shape adapted to receive and maintain a connection (30) ensuring a sealed connection of the two sections of the pair (10a, 10b).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/10; E01D 19/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/10 (2006.01); E01D 19/16 (2006.01); E04B 1/06 (2006.01); E04C 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01D 19/16 (2013.01); E04C 5/10 (2013.01); E01D 2101/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943910A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775492 A1 19990903; FR 2775492 B1 20000505; AT 246757 T 20030815; AU 2526499 A 19990915; DE 69910133 D1 20030911; DE 69910133 T2 20040609; DK 0979332 T3 20031201; EP 0979332 A1 20000216; EP 0979332 B1 20030806; ES 2205771 T3 20040501; HK 1026009 A1 20040227; JP 2001522424 A 20011113; JP 4056094 B2 20080305; PT 979332 E 20031231; TR 9902557 T1 20000522; US 6389764 B1 20020521; WO 9943910 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140224

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160201

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2015-02-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130225

2014-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140408

2014-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-09-11 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130901

2013-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FREYSSINET INTERNATIONAL STUP

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120224

2012-11-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120905

2012-11-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120224

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120225

2012-10-29 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20030404483

- Effective date: 20120905

2012-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20110126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20110125

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-07-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205771 T3

2004-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030404483

2003-12-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-11-25 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KATZAROV S.A.

2003-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910133 P 20030911

2003-09-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO

2003-08-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030806

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19991013