Global Patent Index - EP 0979334 A1

EP 0979334 A1 2000-02-16 - Device for fixing facing slabs

Title (en)

Device for fixing facing slabs

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befestigen von Fassadenplatten

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour fixer des panneaux de façade

Publication

EP 0979334 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98924170 A

Priority

  • DE 19718299 A
  • EP 9802377 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19718299A1] The invention relates to a device (10) to fix facing slabs (14) to a wall (16) using a crossbeam (12) on which the facing slabs (14) can be hung. In order to make the crossbeam (12) stable, said crossbeam is configured as a closed hollow section. This enables heavy facing slabs (14) to be fixed to the wall (16). The invention also relates to vertical beams (32) to support said crossbeams (12). The vertical beams are placed at a distance from the wall (16) and comprise length-adjustable rods (42) which are pivotally connected to the vertical beams and the wall (16). To this end, an individual rod (42) forms a free bearing (4) and two rods (42) arranged at an angle to each other form a fixed bearing (38). By mounting the crossbeam (12) on the wall (16), a simple vertical alignment can be achieved along with simple compensation of uneven wall surfaces. An additional advantage is that no moment is exerted on the wall mountings by the rods (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08; E04B 2/96

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 2/96 (2006.01); E04B 2/72 (2006.01); E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04F 13/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/0808 (2013.01); E04F 13/0816 (2013.01); E04F 13/083 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849412A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19718299 A1 19981105; AR 011470 A1 20000816; AT 262097 T 20040415; BR 9809345 A 20000704; CN 1105817 C 20030416; CN 1254396 A 20000524; DK 0979334 T3 20040510; EP 0979334 A1 20000216; EP 0979334 B1 20040317; ES 2216287 T3 20041016; HK 1027847 A1 20040116; JP 2000511251 A 20000829; PL 200245 B1 20081231; PL 336418 A1 20000619; PT 979334 E 20040730; US 6427410 B1 20020806; WO 9849412 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160422

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160422

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160215

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090423

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090423

2010-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-01-04 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080429

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050422

2007-07-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20061207

2007-04-25 [27C] TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

- Effective date: 20061207

2006-01-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060123

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-11-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-11-28 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-05-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050423

2005-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: COMETEC BAUSYSTEME HOUBEN + SCHUEMANN GMBH

2005-02-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COMETEC BAUSYSTEME HOUBEN + SCHUEMANN GMBH

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2216287 T3

2004-09-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040521

2004-07-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-08 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-04-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-22 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20040422

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811006 P 20040422

2004-04-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20040419

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2004-03-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR FIXING FACING SLABS

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011012

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990909

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL PT SE