Global Patent Index - EP 0979340 B1

EP 0979340 B1 2001-12-12 - DEVICE FOR GUIDING A DOOR WITH FLEXIBLE ROLLER SHUTTER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR GUIDING A DOOR WITH FLEXIBLE ROLLER SHUTTER

Title (de)

FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLEXIBLES HUBTOR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE D'UNE PORTE A RIDEAU SOUPLE

Publication

EP 0979340 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98921543 A

Priority

  • FR 9800763 W
  • FR 9705305 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2762642A1] The invention concerns a device comprising on the door (1) opposite vertical members (2, 3) straps (6a, 6b) facing each other to constitute on each vertical member a guide rail (6c) for the flexible roller shutter (5) and horizontal crosspieces (5b), said straps being stretched and each fixed between two end points (6f, 6h; 6g, 6i) integral with the vertical members (2, 3) to enable each strap, under the pressure of an external force, to be elastically deformed and return to its initial position without deteriorating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/58; E06B 9/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/58 (2006.01); E06B 9/262 (2006.01); E06B 9/42 (2006.01); E06B 9/82 (2006.01); E06B 9/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/82 (2013.01); E06B 9/0653 (2013.01); E06B 9/0692 (2013.01); E06B 9/581 (2013.01); E06B 2009/135 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2762642 A1 19981030; FR 2762642 B1 19990730; AT 210778 T 20011215; AU 719794 B2 20000518; AU 7435998 A 19981113; BR 9808978 A 20000801; CA 2286577 A1 19981029; CA 2286577 C 20050927; CN 1108434 C 20030514; CN 1252850 A 20000510; CZ 298010 B6 20070523; CZ 9903764 A3 20010214; DE 69802919 D1 20020124; DE 69802919 T2 20020822; EP 0979340 A1 20000216; EP 0979340 B1 20011212; ES 2168755 T3 20020616; HU 0002413 A2 20001128; HU 0002413 A3 20020328; IL 132481 A 20020912; IL 132481 D0 20010319; JP 2001526748 A 20011218; JP 4027993 B2 20071226; KR 100375471 B1 20030310; MX PA99009728 A 20020722; NO 995183 A 19991022; NO 995183 D0 19991022; NZ 500356 A 20010831; PL 336529 A1 20000703; RU 2166600 C1 20010510; TR 199902591 T2 20000221; US 2002124972 A1 20020912; US 6192960 B1 20010227; US 6481487 B2 20021119; WO 9848139 A1 19981029

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20180415

2018-05-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2018-05-09 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20180415

2018-04-18 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20180415

2018-04-16 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69802919

2017-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170503

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170426

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-06-06 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2002-12-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168755 T3

2002-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-04-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020416

2002-04-16 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020416

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-03-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69802919 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210778 T 20011215

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010223

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991108

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE