Global Patent Index - EP 0979349 A1

EP 0979349 A1 2000-02-16 - COOLING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE COMBUSTION MOTOR

Title (en)

COOLING DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE COMBUSTION MOTOR

Title (de)

KÜHLVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE D'UN VEHICULE

Publication

EP 0979349 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98916625 A

Priority

  • AT 9800114 W
  • DE 19718704 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19718704A1] The invention relates to a cooling device for a vehicle combustion motor. It comprises a radiator fan (10), a cooling pack (2) and a fan frame (18) which extends from a fan ring (9) enclosing the radiator fan to the cooling pack. The invention seeks to enhance cooling performance with regard to given dimensions of the cooling pack (2) and radiator fan (10). To this end, the fan frame (18) forms a vertical flow channel (23) in the section (12) rising laterally above the projection of the radiator fan (10). In the section (11) rising above the cooling pack (2), the fan frame (18) forms a collecting area (22) which is connected by the flow to the vertical flow channel (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01P 11/10; F04D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/10 (2006.01); F04D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01P 11/10 (2013.01); F04D 19/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850689A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19718704 A1 19981105; AT 220174 T 20020715; AU 7012998 A 19981127; AU 738064 B2 20010906; EP 0979349 A1 20000216; EP 0979349 B1 20020703; ES 2182293 T3 20030301; JP 2001523316 A 20011120; US 6196169 B1 20010306; WO 9850689 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 220174 T

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804677

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150430

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150427

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STEYR-DAIMLER-PUCH FAHRZEUGTECHNIK A.G. & CO. K.G

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-06-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030404

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182293 T3

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021003

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804677 20020808

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220174 T 20020715

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010831

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991027

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE