Global Patent Index - EP 0979350 A1

EP 0979350 A1 2000-02-16 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE MULTIPOINT INJECTION MODULE

Title (en)

INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE MULTIPOINT INJECTION MODULE

Title (de)

MEHRPUNKTEINSPRITZUNGSEINHEIT FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR

Title (fr)

MODULE D'INJECTION MULTI-POINTS POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0979350 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99904943 A

Priority

  • FR 9900412 W
  • FR 9802345 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775318A1] The injector has a bar (10) connected to a pump, and has injectors (12) along its length. Each injector has its own electrically operated on/off valve. The injectors are calibrated at manufacture and the calibration stored in a memory at each injector. The calibration is used by the engine control computer to determine correct timing of the injector on/off valve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/38; F02D 41/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/38 (2013.01); F02D 41/2435 (2013.01); F02D 41/2467 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943940A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775318 A1 19990827; FR 2775318 B1 20000428; BR 9904895 A 20000704; DE 69906642 D1 20030515; DE 69906642 T2 20040304; EP 0979350 A1 20000216; EP 0979350 B1 20030409; US 6247451 B1 20010619; WO 9943940 A1 19990902

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170224

2018-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170224

2017-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170224

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160216

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160212

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNSON CONTROLS AUTOMOTIVE ELECTRONICS

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020328

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991026

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT