Global Patent Index - EP 0979357 A2

EP 0979357 A2 2000-02-16 - HYDROSTATIC DISPLACEMENT DRIVE FOR LIFTING AND LOWERING AND HOLDING LOADS, IN PARTICULAR FOR LIFTS

Title (en)

HYDROSTATIC DISPLACEMENT DRIVE FOR LIFTING AND LOWERING AND HOLDING LOADS, IN PARTICULAR FOR LIFTS

Title (de)

HYDROSTATISCHER ANTRIEB ZUM HEBEN UND SENKEN UND ZUM HALTEN VON LASTEN, INSBESONDERE FÜR AUFZÜGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE HYDROSTATIQUE POUR FAIRE MONTER ET FAIRE DESCENDRE ET POUR MAINTENIR DES CHARGES, NOTAMMENT POUR DES ASCENSEURS

Publication

EP 0979357 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98914771 A

Priority

  • CH 9800173 W
  • CH 100497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849085A2] The invention relates to a hydraulic or pneumatic drive for lifting and lowering loads, in particular for lifts. It has a working cylinder (11) forming a pressure chamber (14) connected to a pressure fluid source (39) and subjected to a pressure fluid. It also has a lifting piston (1) tightly guided in the working cylinder and a guide rod (15) arranged in the working cylinder. The guide rod (15) projects into the interior of the lifting piston (1) which tightly encloses the guide rod (15). The end (4) of the lifting piston (1) which projects into the pressure chamber (14) forms an annular face (5) which is subjected to pressure fluid. The interior of the lifting piston (1) forms an additional pressure chamber (7) subjected to pressure fluid and which is connected to its own pressure fluid source (40). The pressure fluid source connected to the working cylinder (11) delivers pressure fluid at a substantially constant pressure, whereas the pressure fluid source (49) connected to the additional pressure chamber (7) delivers pressure fluid at a variable pressure. The additional pressure chamber (7), subjected to pressure fluid, subdivides the total force needed to lift a load into two partial forces, one of which acts upon the annular face and the other in the interior of the lifting piston, close under the load. In this way, the partial force acting upon the entire length of the lifting piston and subjecting the piston to buckling is substantially reduced. It is thus possible to reduce the amount of material required without affecting buckling resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 11/036; B66B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/04 (2006.01); F15B 11/16 (2006.01); F15B 15/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849085A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849085 A2 19981105; WO 9849085 A3 19990211; AT 233374 T 20030315; AU 6916998 A 19981124; BR 9809430 A 20001114; CH 689211 A5 19981215; CN 1096577 C 20021218; CN 1255959 A 20000607; DE 59807321 D1 20030403; EP 0979357 A2 20000216; EP 0979357 B1 20030226; ES 2189153 T3 20030701; JP 2001527497 A 20011225; PT 979357 E 20030731; TR 9902647 T2 20000321; US 6422349 B1 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100429

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100428

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051028

2005-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050428

2004-04-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040423

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-22 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040422

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189153 T3

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807321 P 20030403

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020423

2000-05-24 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: WITTUR AG

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991020

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT