Global Patent Index - EP 0979378 A1

EP 0979378 A1 2000-02-16 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EXTRACTING MOISTURE AND/OR MOLD FROM A STRUCTURE OF A BUILDING

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR EXTRACTING MOISTURE AND/OR MOLD FROM A STRUCTURE OF A BUILDING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND V0RRICHTUNG ZUM ENTFERNEN VON FEUCHTIGKEIT UND/ODER SCHIMMEL AUS EINER GEBÄAUDEKONSTRUKTION

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'EXTRAIRE L'HUMIDITE ET/OU LA MOISISSURE DE LA STRUCTURE D'UN BATIMENT

Publication

EP 0979378 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913778 A

Priority

  • FI 9800311 W
  • FI 971482 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9845653A1] Procedure for removing moisture and/or mould from a structure in a building, e.g. from a floor, wall or equivalent, in which procedure air is circulated in the vicinity of the structure to be dried and/or the structure is heated by applying periodic phases of heating and cooling to it. The structure is heated through its essential thickness using an infrared radiator (2) to a raised temperature sufficient to remove moisture and possible mould, and the surface of the structure is cooled via continuous air flushing so that the surface temperature of the structure becomes lower than its inside temperature raised by heating, with the result that the moisture in the warm structure tends to drift towards the cooler surface and is removed from the surface by the air flushing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/70 (2006.01); F26B 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/70 (2013.01); F26B 3/283 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9845653A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9845653 A1 19981015; AU 6834698 A 19981030; DE 69806000 D1 20020718; DE 69806000 T2 20030102; DE 69806000 T3 20080403; DK 0979378 T3 20020916; DK 0979378 T4 20080107; EP 0979378 A1 20000216; EP 0979378 B1 20020612; EP 0979378 B2 20070822; FI 105950 B 20001031; FI 971482 A0 19970409; FI 971482 A 19981010; NO 326062 B1 20080908; NO 994944 A 19991011; NO 994944 D0 19991011

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160408

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150413

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110409

2012-06-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110408

2012-02-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111101

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-11-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-11-25 [LTLA] LT: LAPSE OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-11-09 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69806000

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100423

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100528

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100415

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100416

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-02-29 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2008-02-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2008-01-07 [REG DK T4] TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT

2007-12-11 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2007-11-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070822

2007-08-22 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070822

2007-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB IT NL SE

2007-08-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV

2007-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: CRAMO OYJ

2007-04-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CRAMO OYJ

- Effective date: 20030307

2004-03-19 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2003-12-01 [NLUE] NL: LICENCE REGISTERED WITH REGARD TO EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-10-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RAKENTAJAIN KONEVUOKRAAMO OYJ/ POLATHERM OY

2003-05-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RAKENTAJAIN KONEVUOKRAAMO OYJ/ POLATHERM OY

- Effective date: 20030307

2002-09-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-09-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806000 20020718

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB IT NL SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19991103;LV PAYMENT 19991103

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020612

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991103

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19991103;LV PAYMENT 19991103