Global Patent Index - EP 0979382 A1

EP 0979382 A1 2000-02-16 - BOTTLENECK AMMUNITION WITH HIGH MUZZLE VELOCITY

Title (en)

BOTTLENECK AMMUNITION WITH HIGH MUZZLE VELOCITY

Title (de)

FLASCHENHALS-FÖRMIGE MUNITION MIT HOHER MÜNDUNGSGESCHWINDIGKEIT

Title (fr)

MUNITIONS A EPAULEMENT A VITESSE INITIALE ELEVEE

Publication

EP 0979382 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97941109 A

Priority

  • GB 9702581 W
  • GB 9708629 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2324850A] Ammunition suitable for firing from a self-loading sidearm comprising a cartridge 1 adapted to fire a projectile 6, the cartridge case 1 having at one end a portion of reduced diameter 3, the projectile 6 being held in the said portion of reduced diameter 3, wherein the ratio of the external diameter of the cartridge case at its widest point to the external diameter of the projectile 6 at its widest point is such that when the projectile 6 is fired into a target high velocity wounding is caused. The said ratio is greater than 1.26 to 1 and the length of the case 1 is less than 26mm. The invention also relates to a gun barrel 10 for a self-loading sidearm through which the ammunition can be shot, and a self-loading sidearm comprising such a barrel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/26 (2006.01); F41A 21/00 (2006.01); F41C 3/00 (2006.01); F42B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 5/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849515A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

GB 2324850 A 19981104; GB 2324850 B 20020220; GB 9809041 D0 19980624; AT 310938 T 20051215; AU 4313297 A 19981124; CA 2322411 A1 19981105; DE 19782273 T1 20000621; DE 69734727 D1 20051229; DE 69734727 T2 20060824; EP 0979382 A1 20000216; EP 0979382 B1 20051123; ES 2255110 T3 20060616; GB 9708629 D0 19970618; HU 0002146 A2 20001128; HU 0002146 A3 20001228; HU 225974 B1 20080228; RU 2221212 C2 20040110; TR 9902707 T2 20010321; WO 9849515 A1 19981105

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090923

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110706

2011-07-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110718

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090922

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090922

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAUER NICODEMUS ERAN

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BAUER GERARD MIET

- Effective date: 20090930

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080730

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080829

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080725

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2255110 T3

2005-12-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69734727 P 20051229

2005-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-11-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991120

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR IT LI