Global Patent Index - EP 0979436 A1

EP 0979436 A1 2000-02-16 - OPTICAL SWITCH MATRIX COMPRISING AN IMPROVED LEAD PATTERN

Title (en)

OPTICAL SWITCH MATRIX COMPRISING AN IMPROVED LEAD PATTERN

Title (de)

OPTISCHE SCHALTMATRIX MIT SEINEM LEITUNGSMUSTER

Title (fr)

MATRICE DE COMMUTATION OPTIQUE COMPRENANT UN MOTIF DE CONDUCTEURS AMELIORE

Publication

EP 0979436 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98925517 A

Priority

  • EP 98925517 A
  • EP 9802588 W
  • EP 97201287 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850823A1] The invention pertains to an optical device comprising a cascade of optical switches, elements (5) for driving the switches, bond pads (6) for connecting the device to peripheral equipment, and leads (7) for electrically connecting the elements to the bond pads, wherein, in top view, at least part of each lead (7) runs both substantially parallel to at least one adjacent lead (7) and obliquely with respect to the central longitudinal axis (8) of the device. The device of the present invention is more compact than cnventional devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/313; H04Q 3/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/313 (2006.01); H04Q 3/52 (2006.01); G02F 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02F 1/313 (2013.01); G02F 1/0147 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850823A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850823 A1 19981112; AU 7761098 A 19981127; CA 2288085 A1 19981112; EP 0979436 A1 20000216; TW 338802 B 19980821

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021017

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020418

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JDS UNIPHASE PHOTONICS C.V.

2001-05-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JDS FITEL PHOTONICS C.V.

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991126

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL