Global patent index - EP 0979477 A1

EP 0979477 A1 2000-02-16 - CLIENT PROFILE MANAGEMENT WITHIN A MARKETING SYSTEM

Title (en)

CLIENT PROFILE MANAGEMENT WITHIN A MARKETING SYSTEM

Title (de)

KUNDENPROFILBEARBEITUNG INNERHALB EINES MARKETINGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

GESTION DE PROFIL CLIENT DANS UN SYSTEME DE MERCATIQUE

Publication

EP 0979477 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98913365 A

Priority

  • US 9806448 W
  • US 84592097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849640A1] A computer system includes a database and management software for managing client profiles that are used in marketing contacts. The management software is able to receive and process input data from multiple provider sources for addition to the database. The processing that is perfomed may include that application of data hygiene rules and the reformatting of data into a standardized format. The processing may also include the application of matching rules to determine whether a client profile already exists for the client that is associated with the input data. Overlay rules may be applied to resolve how a client profile shoud be uptdated when a client profile already exists for the client associated with the input data. In this fashion, the management software is able to readily update the database with data received from multiple data sources.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849640A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849640 A1 19981105; AU 6793498 A 19981124; CA 2287158 A1 19981105; EP 0979477 A1 20000216; JP 2002511166 A 20020409

INPADOC legal status

2006-11-10 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1023419

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-10-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030325

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011023

2000-05-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MCI WORLDCOM, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991029

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IE IT LI NL SE