Global Patent Index - EP 0979479 A1

EP 0979479 A1 2000-02-16 - NETWORK COMPUTER TRADING SYSTEM

Title (en)

NETWORK COMPUTER TRADING SYSTEM

Title (de)

COMPUTER-NETZWERK-HANDELSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME COMMERCIAL INFORMATIQUE EN RESEAU

Publication

EP 0979479 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919331 A

Priority

  • GB 9801240 W
  • GB 9716983 A
  • GB 9721355 A
  • US 4522997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849639A1] A network computer trading system is provided comprising a central server station (1) connected to a number of user stations (2) by a high band width distribution system (3). The central server station (1) includes a mass data storage system (13) having stored therein a main input interface for inputting a selection of a type of commodity to be traded and a plurality of commodity interfaces for inputting product details of specific commodities, wherein each of the plurality of commodity interfaces is arranged to enable the input of data relating to a respective different one of a plurality of commodities. A user can select which type of commodity he wishes to trade via the main input interface and then enter data relevant to trading that commodity using the respective commodity interface.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849639A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849639 A1 19981105; AU 7220998 A 19981124; CA 2288142 A1 19981105; CN 1261450 A 20000726; EP 0979479 A1 20000216; GB 2339941 A 20000209; GB 2339941 B 20011031; GB 9925568 D0 19991229; JP 2001524236 A 20011127

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025823

2001-04-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-03-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRUSTMARQUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2000-03-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TRUSTMARQUE INTERNATIONAL LIMITED

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991125

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE