Global Patent Index - EP 0979480 A1

EP 0979480 A1 2000-02-16 - OPERATING RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

Title (en)

OPERATING RESOURCE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM

Title (de)

VERWALTUNGSSYSTEM FÜR INFORMATIONSMITTEL

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE GESTION DE RESSOURCES DE FONCTIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 0979480 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98919907 A

Priority

  • US 9808407 W
  • US 4437297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849644A1] A software system efficiently procures operating resources within an enterprise. A requisition record generating module generates a requisition record for a requisition. The requisition record indicates at least an operating resource that a requestor desires to purchase. The requisition record generating module generates the requisition record responsive to a combination of input by a requestor and operating resource information in an operating resource information database. An approval path determining module, responsive to the requisition record and to approval rules in an approval rules database, determines an approval path for the requisition record, among various ones of a plurality of possible approvers, required to approve the requisition record. An approval path handling module guides the requisition record along the determined approval path, and the approval path handling module generates a global approval indication in response to the requisition record successfully traversing the approval path.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/087 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849644A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849644 A1 19981105; AU 7259198 A 19981124; AU 751847 B2 20020829; BR 9809314 A 20010717; CA 2287850 A1 19981105; EP 0979480 A1 20000216; JP 2002504245 A 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2006-12-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025647

2004-08-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040321

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030219

2000-09-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARIBA, INC.

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991104

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19991104;LT PAYMENT 19991104;LV PAYMENT 19991104;MK PAYMENT 19991104;RO PAYMENT 19991104;SI PAYMENT 19991104