Global patent index - EP 0979494 A1

EP 0979494 A1 2000-02-16 - BAR CODE READER FOR A FUEL DISPENSER

Title (en)

BAR CODE READER FOR A FUEL DISPENSER

Title (de)

STRICHKODELESER FÜR KRAFTSTOFFABGABEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

LECTEUR OPTIQUE DE CODES BARRES POUR DISTRIBUTEUR DE CARBURANT

Publication

EP 0979494 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98907586 A

Priority

  • US 9803474 W
  • US 3900797 P
  • US 2663498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837518A1] A system and method to adapt a fuel dispenser (12) and related facilities to accept bar coded cards in addition to or instead of magnetic strip cards. A standard bar code reader is used in conjuction with a magnetic strip card reader. The bar code reader includes a light detector and a light source. The light detector and light source are secured so that they may visually access a card in the magnetic strip card reader. This allows the light detector to access bar coded data that is printed on a bar coded card. Furthermore, the addition of the bar code reader does not prevent the magnetic strip card reader from also reading a magnetic strip if it is present on the card. When a bar coded card is slid into the magnetic strip card reader, the bar code reader interprets the signals which generated thereby and "decodes" the signals into corresponding numbers. These numbers are then sent over a data bus to a controller, where they are interpreted. Once interpreted, the numbers can be used similarly to numbers conventionally produced by a magnetic strip card, or can be used separately to provide additional services and/or advantages, such as updating a frequent purchase accounts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 15/02 (2006.01); B67D 7/14 (2010.01); B67D 7/24 (2010.01); G06K 7/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/10 (2006.01); G06Q 20/00 (2012.01); G07F 7/02 (2006.01); G07F 13/02 (2006.01); G07G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/14 (2013.01); G06K 7/0004 (2013.01); G06K 7/10782 (2013.01); G06Q 20/20 (2013.01); G06Q 20/28 (2013.01); G06Q 20/342 (2013.01); G06Q 30/02 (2013.01); G07F 7/025 (2013.01); G07F 13/025 (2013.01); G07G 1/0045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837518 A1 19980827; AU 6335298 A 19980909; EP 0979494 A1 20000216; EP 0979494 A4 20000524; JP 2002512579 A 20020423; US 6112981 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status

2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020903

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DRESSER, INC. (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-08-09 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 19990924

2000-06-28 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17P

2000-05-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-05-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 15/02 A, 7G 07F 13/02 B, 7G 06K 7/00 B

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990924

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE