Global Patent Index - EP 0979544 A1

EP 0979544 A1 2000-02-16 - A PLUG AND SOCKET ASSEMBLY FOR REMOTE HANDLING

Title (en)

A PLUG AND SOCKET ASSEMBLY FOR REMOTE HANDLING

Title (de)

EINE FERNMANIPULIERBARE STECKER- UND KUPPLUNGSANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE FICHE ET DOUILLE PERMETTANT UNE MANIPULATION A DISTANCE

Publication

EP 0979544 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98917417 A

Priority

  • GB 9801150 W
  • GB 9708712 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9849757A1] A plug and socket assembly for remote handling and making and breaking a connection therebetween is described, the plug and socket assembly comprising a plug portion and a socket portion having mutual co-operating features to establish a connection therebetween; said plug portion and said socket portion having a substantially common connection making and breaking axis; at least one of said plug portion and said socket portion having a deflectable resilient biasing member which biases said plug portion or said socket portion towards said common making and breaking axis; and, handling means associated with the resilient biasing member remote from said plug or socket portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/26; G21F 7/06; H01R 13/631

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G21D 1/00 (2006.01); G21F 3/00 (2006.01); G21F 7/005 (2006.01); G21F 7/06 (2006.01); H01R 13/631 (2006.01); H01R 43/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 43/26 (2013.01); G21F 7/066 (2013.01); H01R 13/6315 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9849757A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9849757 A1 19981105; AU 7065098 A 19981124; DE 69806242 D1 20020801; DE 69806242 T2 20030220; EP 0979544 A1 20000216; EP 0979544 B1 20020626; GB 9708712 D0 19970618; JP 2001522515 A 20011113; ZA 9803378 B 19980624

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100420

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100420

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-07-18 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-11-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-12-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69806242

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-01

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010531

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991119

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB