Global patent index - EP 0979548 B1

EP 0979548 B1 2001-03-14 - METHOD FOR TRIGGERING A GAS INSULATED SWITCHING SPARK GAP AND DEVICE USING SAID METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TRIGGERING A GAS INSULATED SWITCHING SPARK GAP AND DEVICE USING SAID METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR TRIGGERUNG EINER GASISOLIERTEN SCHALTFUNKENSTRECKE UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'AMOR AGE D'UN ECLATEUR DE COMMUTATION ISOLE PAR GAZ ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE METTRE LEDIT PROCEDE EN OEUVRE

Publication

EP 0979548 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98919199 A

Priority

  • DE 19718660 A
  • EP 9801877 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19718660A1] The invention relates to a method for triggering a gas insulated switching spark gap and to the spark gap itself. Triggering requires only a small amount of energy using a coherently or incoherently scattering, triggering light source illuminating the gap between the electrodes. The triggering light source releases electrons from the metal particles present in the insulating gas of the switching spark gap. Said electrons are used as starting electrons to form sparking conduits. The metal aerosol is produced in a spark gap, an aerosol generator, with electrodes made from said metal aerosol material. One of the constituents of the insulating gas flows through the aerosol generator. The insulating gas in the switching spark gap consists of at least one constituent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 2/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 2/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19718660 A1 19981119; DE 19718660 C2 20020814; EP 0979548 A1 20000216; EP 0979548 B1 20010314; JP 2000513139 A 20001003; WO 9850990 A1 19981112

INPADOC legal status

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-02-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041231

2004-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-04-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2004-01-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040126

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-04-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-01-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030121

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-07-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800537

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-19

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990730

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB