Global Patent Index - EP 0979621 A1

EP 0979621 A1 2000-02-16 - Sportshoe

Title (en)

Sportshoe

Title (de)

Sportschuh

Title (fr)

Chaussure de sport

Publication

EP 0979621 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99112989 A

Priority

FR 9810489 A

Abstract (en)

The boot consists of an upper (110), an insole assembly (120) and an outer sole (140). The lower edge (112) of the upper is joined to the insole assembly, and the latter is connected directly to the snowboard fastening (130). The outer sole is fixed with adhesive to the upper and insole assembly, and the insole assembly is made from a rigid or semi-rigid material, such as titanium or a composition material, at least in the fastening anchoring zone.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une chaussure de sport, notamment sport de glisse comportant au moins un organe d'accrochage (13, 130) à un engin de glisse, et constituée d'une tige (10, 110) et d'une semelle de marche externe (14, 140). La tige (10, 110) est fixée le long de sa périphérie inférieure (11a, 112) sur une première de montage (12, 120), l'organe d'accrochage (13, 130) est ancré directement sur la première de montage (12, 120), et la semelle de marche (14, 140) est fixée par collage sur l'ensemble tige - première de montage - organe d'accrochage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 13/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01); A43B 13/12 (2006.01); A43B 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0401 (2013.01); A43B 5/0403 (2013.01); A43B 5/0423 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979621 A1 20000216; FR 2782249 A1 20000218; FR 2782249 B1 20001110; JP 2000050904 A 20000222

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030621

2002-05-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020409

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-06-28 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI