Global Patent Index - EP 0979623 A1

EP 0979623 A1 2000-02-16 - Automatic spreading umbrella

Title (en)

Automatic spreading umbrella

Title (de)

Automatisch öffnender Schirm

Title (fr)

Parasol à ouverture automatique

Publication

EP 0979623 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98306395 A

Priority

EP 98306395 A

Abstract (en)

An umbrella includes a handle shaft (40) has a tubular top end portion (40T) with a distal end surface and a stop member (42) disposed in the top end portion (40T) and spaced apart from the distal end surface. A hub (60) is mounted on the top end portion (40T) of the handle shaft (40). A lower runner (50) is mounted slidably on the handle shaft (40) and is movable toward and away from the hub (60). A rib assembly (80) is mounted pivotally at one end on the hub (60). A stretcher assembly (100) is connected operably to the rib assembly (80) and the lower runner (50). An upper runner (70) has an enlarged head (72) disposed above the hub (60), and a guide shaft (71) that extends from the enlarged head (72) and into the tubular top end portion (40T) of the handle shaft (40). A compression spring (90) is sleeved on the guide shaft (71) of the upper runner (70), and has a bottom end that is disposed in the top end portion (40T) of the handle shaft (40) and that abuts against the stop member (42), and a top end that extends outwardly of the top end portion (40T) of the handle shaft (40) and that abuts against the head (72) of the upper runner (70). A spreader assembly (200) is connected operably to the rib assembly (80) and the head (72) of the upper runner (70). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 25/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 25/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979623 A1 20000216; EP 0979623 B1 20040414; AT 264074 T 20040415; DE 69823181 D1 20040519; DE 69823181 T2 20050127; ES 2217507 T3 20041101

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050810

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040914

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060811

2007-04-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060811

2007-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070301

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050812

2005-08-12 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050812

2005-08-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050810

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-08-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050804

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2217507 T3

2004-09-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040927

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69823181 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020116

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI