Global Patent Index - EP 0979624 A2

EP 0979624 A2 2000-02-16 - Container for smale items, for example keys, money and/or a telecommunication apparatus

Title (en)

Container for smale items, for example keys, money and/or a telecommunication apparatus

Title (de)

Behältnis für Kleingegenstände, insbesondere Schlüssel, Bargeld und/oder Klein-Telekommunikationsgeräte

Title (fr)

Conteneur pour petits ustensiles, par exemple des clefs, de l'argent et/ou appareil de télécomunication

Publication

EP 0979624 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99113816 A

Priority

DE 29814500 U

Abstract (en)

The container (1) is fastened to the body of the user. It corresponds in size to the back (2') of the user's hand (2). The container has a tape (13) fastened to one end, which passes around the wrist (20), and two looped tapes (14,14') at the other end. Index finger and ring finger (22,24) pass through the loops. The wrist tape is elastic and/or length-adjustable and/or can be tied. The container has an opening, facing the wrist, which may be closed similar to a rucksack, by a pivoted flap or hood (11) with adhesive or locking closure (12). It consists mainly of textile materials, plastic, or leather.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Behältnis (1) für Kleingegenstände, insbesondere Schlüssel, Bargeld und/oder Klein-Telekommunikationsgeräte, wobei das Behältnis (1) am Körper einer dieses benutzenden Person halterbar ist. Das neue Behältnis ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Behältnis (1) eine Größe aufweist, die maximal der Größe des Handrückens (2') einer Hand (2) der Benutzerperson entspricht, und daß das Behältnis (1) zur Halterung auf dem Handrücken (2') an seinem einen Ende mindestens ein um das Handgelenk (20) der Hand (2) führbares Band (13) und an seinem anderen Ende mindestens ein weiteres, schlaufenförmiges Band (14, 14'), durch das ein oder mehrere Finger (22, 24) hindurchführbar ist/sind, aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 1/04 (2006.01); A45F 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 1/04 (2013.01); A45F 5/00 (2013.01); A45F 2005/008 (2013.01); A45F 2200/0516 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814500 U1 19981001; EP 0979624 A2 20000216; EP 0979624 A3 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI