Global patent index - EP 0979625 A1

EP 0979625 A1 2000-02-16 - Construction for a better air circulation for the dorsale part of a backpack

Title (en)

Construction for a better air circulation for the dorsale part of a backpack

Title (de)

Konstruktion zur besseren Luftzirkulation bei Rucksackrückenpartien

Title (fr)

Construction pour une meilleure circulation d'air por la partie dorsale d'un sac à dos

Publication

EP 0979625 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98115230 A

Priority

EP 98115230 A

Abstract (en)

AT the back of the rucksack there is a one-piece plastics component (10) and a pretensioned mesh (9). The plastics component has two vertically aligned reinforcement side parts (1) with a centre middle web (2) connected in the upper third to the two vertically aligned side parts. Underneath, the vertical centre part is connected to the side parts by a horizontal web (4). An additional horizontal cross connection (6) runs between the vertical side parts in the upper third and in the lower half there are two additional diagonal reinforcements (7). The two lower ends of the component are connected together by an elastic cross strap (8) which gives the lower horizontal web a concave curvature.

Abstract (de)

Konstruktion zur besseren Luftzirkulation bei Rucksackrückenpartien, die aus einer einteiligen Kunststoffkomponente(10), sowie einem vorgespannten Netz(9) mit einem Querband(8) besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45F 3/04 (2013.01); A45F 2003/125 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

AT 1945 U1 19980225 - DREXEL JOHANNES [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979625 A1 20000216

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020423

2000-11-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI