Global Patent Index - EP 0979626 A1

EP 0979626 A1 2000-02-16 - Underframe for furniture

Title (en)

Underframe for furniture

Title (de)

Möbeluntergestell

Title (fr)

Piètement pour meuble

Publication

EP 0979626 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402020 A

Priority

FR 9810307 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly consists of three or more legs (121, 122, 124. 125) and at least two struts (131, 132, 133, 134) to support a table top (100), chair seat or other article of furniture. The struts are positioned between crosspieces (111, 112) under the table top and the legs, and the resulting triangular supports are held together by a system of cords (140, 150) with winding rods (141, 151) to tension them or adjustable threaded rods. The assembly can be made from wood, plastic, metal or other material with similar strength and rigidity.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un piètement pour meuble. Le meuble (100) comporte un plateau (110), au moins trois pieds (121, 122, 124, 125) et au moins deux arc-boutants (131, 132, 133, 134). Les arc-boutants reposent entre une (des) traverse(s) (111, 112, 113, 114) du plateau et les pieds. Un système de fixation à tension variable (140, 141; 150, 151) permet ensuite d'immobiliser les triangulations (190;180) formées par les pieds, le plateau et les arcs-boutants. Ce piètement permet de fabriquer des meubles démontables et remontables facilement et rapidement sans avoir recours à l'utilisation d'un outil quelconque. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 3/091; A47B 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/06 (2006.01); A47B 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/12 (2013.01); A47B 3/06 (2013.01); A47B 2200/0064 (2013.01); A47B 2220/09 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979626 A1 20000216; FR 2782251 A1 20000218; FR 2782251 B1 20001013

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-03-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PIECE OF FURNITURE MOUNTABLE WITHOUT TOOL

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021018

2001-01-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DE GRIVEL, PATRICE

2001-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DE GRIVEL, PATRICE

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990917

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 19990917;SI