Global Patent Index - EP 0979632 A2

EP 0979632 A2 2000-02-16 - Suction device

Title (en)

Suction device

Title (de)

Sauggerät

Title (fr)

Aspirateur

Publication

EP 0979632 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111838 A

Priority

DE 29814384 U

Abstract (en)

The apparatus has a branch (22) in its air flow channel (13) which has a through hole (23) for the passage of clean air to a clean air exit (19). On the other side of the branch is a connection opening (24) for an air pipe (21). A switching component (25) is moved between a position where the connection opening is closed and the clean air exit is open and a second position where the connection opening is open and the clean air exit is shut. The air pipe operates the switching component when the pipe is attached at the connection opening. When the air pipe is inserted, the switch is moved from one position to the other. A sprung component (33) to operate the switching component is formed integral with it.

Abstract (de)

Ein Sauggerät (1) zum Ansaugen von Schmutz oder dgl. und Luft als Trägermedium enthaltendem Sauggut, beispielsweise Staubluft weist ein den Saugstrom erzeugendes Gebläse (7) auf. Der Schmutz oder dgl. wird im Sauggerät (1) abgesondert, und die vom Schmutz oder dgl. befreite Reinluft wird durch einen Strömungskanal (13) zu einer Ausblasöffnung (19) geführt, an der die Reinluft in die Umgebung ausgeblasen wird. Der Strömungskanal (13) enthält eine Verzweigungsstelle (22), an der einerseits eine Durchtrittsöffnung (23) für den Durchtritt der Reinluft zur Ausblasöffnung (19) und andererseits eine Anschlußöffnung (24) zum Anschließen eines Luftschlauches angeordnet sind. Eine von außen her betätigbare Umstelleinrichtung (25) ist zwischen einer die Anschlußöffnung (24) verschließenden und die Durchtrittsöffnung (23) freigebenden ersten Stellung und einer die Anschlußöffnung (24) freigebenden und die Durchtrittsöffnung (23) verschließenden zweiten Stellung verstellbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 5/36; A47L 5/32; A47L 9/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/32 (2006.01); A47L 5/36 (2006.01); A47L 9/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/32 (2013.01); A47L 5/36 (2013.01); A47L 9/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29814384 U1 19981022; EP 0979632 A2 20000216; EP 0979632 A3 20020508

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021109

2003-03-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TTS TOOLTECHNIC SYSTEMS AG & CO. KG

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI