Global Patent Index - EP 0979679 A2

EP 0979679 A2 2000-02-16 - Cyclone separator

Title (en)

Cyclone separator

Title (de)

Zyklonabscheider

Title (fr)

Séparateur à cyclone

Publication

EP 0979679 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810671 A

Priority

CH 166198 A

Abstract (en)

The cyclone separator has a closed casing (1) and an input channel (11) for the dirty air. It is in the form of an inverted truncated cone open at the bottom. An immersion tube (12) is let into the cover from above, extending partly into the casing. An exhaust air channel goes from the immersion tube to a clean air filter. A trap cone (3) is connected to the cyclone casing, acting as a funnel to collect the separated material and take it to a collecting container (4).

Abstract (de)

Ein Zyklonabscheider mit einem oben abgedeckt geschlossenen Zyklongehäuse (1) und mit einem Zufuhrkanal (11) für die Zufuhr der belasteten Luft weist die Form eines kopfstehenden, unten offenen Kegelstumpfes auf. Konzentrisch ist von oben ein Tauchrohr (12) in die Abdeckung (14) eingelassen. Es reicht teilweise in das Zyklongehäuse (1) hinein. Vom Tauchrohr (12) führt ein Abluftkanal weg, beispielsweise zu einem Reinluftfilter. An das unten offene Zyklongehäuse (1) schliesst ein Auffangkonus (3) an, welcher wie ein Trichter das abgeschiedene Material sammelt und abwärts in einen Sammelbehälter (4) leitet. Eine besondere Ausgestaltung des Tauchrohres (12) vermindert ein Ablagern von ausgeschiedenem Material an diesem selbst. Zusätzlich kann Reinigungsluft (RL) in den Bereich des Tauchrohres (12) gezielt eingeblasen werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04C 5/22; B04C 5/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04C 5/13 (2006.01); B04C 5/14 (2006.01); B04C 5/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04C 5/14 (2013.01); B04C 5/13 (2013.01); B04C 5/22 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979679 A2 20000216; EP 0979679 A3 20010314

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050201

2002-08-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHWEIZER, WALTER

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHWEIZER, WALTER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-03-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 04C 5/22 A, 7B 04C 5/14 B, 7B 04C 5/13 B

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI