Global Patent Index - EP 0979682 A1

EP 0979682 A1 2000-02-16 - Powder dosing device with dosing disk

Title (en)

Powder dosing device with dosing disk

Title (de)

Pulverdosiereinrichtung mit Dosierscheibe

Title (fr)

Doseur de poudres avec disque de dosage

Publication

EP 0979682 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99115100 A

Priority

DE 19836782 A

Abstract (en)

The dosing device has a dosing pump (1) with a dosing disk (4) able to be rotated between sideplates (2, 3) and an injector pump (5). The dosing pump has an inlet for powder-air mixture and an outlet (7) connected by an induction tube (8) to the injector pump. The powder-air mixture is then transported to the outlet by a negative pressure flow created in the injector pump.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Pulverdosiereinrichtung zur Bereitstellung von Pulver, insbesondere zur Pulverbeschichtung beschrieben. Die Pulverdosiereinrichtung weist eine Dosierpumpe (1) mit einer zwischen Seitenplatten (2,3) angeordneten drehangetriebenen Dosierscheibe (4) und eine Injektorpumpe (5) auf. Die Dosierpumpe (1) besitzt einen Einlaß, über welchen ihr ein Pulver-Luft-Gemisch zugeführt wird, und einen Auslaß (7), welcher über ein Saugrohr (8) mit der Injektorpumpe (5) verbunden ist. Von dem Auslaß (7) wird das mittels der Dosierscheibe (4) zum Auslaß (7) transportierte Pulver-Luft-Gemisch durch eine in der Injektorpumpe (5) erzeugte, der Dosierpumpe (1) über einen Sauganschluß (9) einströmende Unterdruckströmung abgesaugt und schließlich einem Verbraucher zugeführt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 5/16 (2006.01); B05B 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 7/144 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979682 A1 20000216; JP 2000061368 A 20000229; US 6257804 B1 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050205

2004-04-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030812

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI