Global Patent Index - EP 0979689 A2

EP 0979689 A2 2000-02-16 -

Publication

EP 0979689 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115314 A

Priority

DE 19835962 A

Abstract (en)

The bundle height minimizing process is applied to wire bundles in a bundle building chamber (2). Individual wire windings are fed onto a horizontal transporting section (6), and at the end, are brought into a roughly vertical falling motion, falling into the chamber. The wire windings are laid out of their fall line eccentrically to the axis of symmetry (x-x) of the bundle building chamber, with a variable angle offset between two successive windings.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zum Minimieren der Bundhöhe von in einer Bundbildekammer (2) entstehenden Drahtbunden, wobei einzelne Drahtwindungen auf eine horizontalen Transportstrecke (6) angefördert, und an deren Ende in eine annährend vertikale Fallbewegung gebracht, und unter Bildung eines Bundes in eine Bundbildekammer (2) fallen, wird eine Minimierung der Bundhöhe dadurch erreicht, daß die Drahtwindungen aus ihrer Falllinie exzentrisch zur Symmetrieachse (x-x) der Bundbildekammer (2) abgelegt werden, und ein Winkelversatz () zwischen jeweils zwei aufeinanderfolgenden Windungen nach Maßgabe der Anzahl von Drahtwindungen (NW), die pro 360° in der Bundbildekammer gelegt werden, variabel eingestellt wird. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/02 (2006.01); B21C 47/14 (2006.01); B21C 47/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/146 (2013.01); B21C 47/14 (2013.01); B21C 47/265 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0979689 A2 20000216; EP 0979689 A3 20010425; EP 0979689 B1 20040428; AT 265283 T 20040515; DE 19835962 A1 20000217; JP 2000071011 A 20000307; US 6405958 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050803

2006-04-25 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2005-08-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-08-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-08-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050803

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-09-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040816

2004-08-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040810

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-08-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040805

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-07-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040730

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909299

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR MINIMISING THE HEIGHT OF WIRE BUNDLES IN A COILING CHAMBER

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE GB IT SE

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990824

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI