Global Patent Index - EP 0979690 A1

EP 0979690 A1 2000-02-16 - Straightening machine

Title (en)

Straightening machine

Title (de)

Biegerichtmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à dresser

Publication

EP 0979690 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98710011 A

Priority

  • EP 98710011 A
  • DE 29810731 U

Abstract (en)

The bending-straightening machine involves an operating device is designed as a bridge (18) which accommodates a straightening stamp (22) between the straightening supports for bearing upon a workpiece (5), in the vertical alignment of the workpiece. Using a drive (16), the bridge can be adjusted in a vertical plane (12). The bridge is supported in the machine table in movable fashion relative to this. The drive is located above the bridge and is supported in the machine table. It can be adjusted by at least one adjusting element (29) driven by this.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Biegerichtmaschine für längliche Werkstücke (5). Sie weist auf einem Maschinentisch (1) angeordnete Werkstückaufnahmen (3) zum drehbaren Erfassen der Enden des Werkstückes auf. Mindestens zwei im Abstand auf dem Maschinenteil angeordnete Richtunterlagen (8) stützen das Werkstück in seiner Längsrichtung. Es ist mindestens ein zwischen den Richtunterlagen angeordneter Richtstempel zum Einwirken auf das Werkstück vorgesehen. Mittels eines Antriebes (16) ist eine Betätigungsvorrichtung (18) in Richtung des Werkstücks und von diesem weg verstellbar, die den Richtstempel aufnimmt. Die Betätigungsvorrichtung ist als Brücke (18) ausgebildet, die den Richtstempel in der vertikalen Flucht des Werkstückes aufnimmt. Mittels mindestens eines vom Antrieb angetriebenen Stellelementes (29) ist die Brücke in einer vertikalen Ebene (12) verstellbar. Erfindungsgemäß ist vorgesehen, daß die Brücke im Maschinentisch relativ zu diesem beweglich gelagert ist, sowie der Antrieb oberhalb der Brücke angeordnet und im Maschinentisch gelagert ist. Die Biegerichtmaschine ermöglicht es, die Biegekräfte optimal in das längliche Werkstück einzuleiten, ferner die Maschinenkräfte auf kurzem Weg vom Antrieb auf die Betätigungsvorrichtung zu übertragen. Bei einfacher Bauweise der Maschine ist ein exaktes, richtungsgenaues Biegerichten des Werkstücks gewährleistet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29810731 U1 19991021; EP 0979690 A1 20000216; EP 0979690 B1 20010822

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160817

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150616

2016-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150616

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110616

2012-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KBH PRODUKTIONS-AUTOMATION G.M.B.H. & CO. VERTRIE

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060617

2006-06-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060616

2005-07-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050704

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011117

2001-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2001-09-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801256 20010927

2001-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-08-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 204519 T 20010915

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000915

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-02-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990519

2000-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-02-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI